Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gray, Ryan, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Mark P Velez, against Sutter Valley Hospitals, O'Kane, Ashley, Does 1 - 50, represented by Jeffery Owensby, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Benjamin G. Davidian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin G. Davidian Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions919 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time931 days |
Motion for Continuance of Trial filed.
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint) filed.
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Stipulation filed.
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Non Opposition to Motion to Amend Complaint) filed.
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Warren Hodges in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint filed.
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: June 28, 2018Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney submitted by Owensby, Jeffery rejected on 10/24/2016 .
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Peremptory Challenge filed.
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Settlement Conference generated .
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Correspondence (confirming changing of reservation for MSJ from 4/20/18 to 9/6/18) filed.
Date: February 09, 2018Correspondence (Confirming Letter - 9/6/18 hearing dropped from calendar) filed.
Date: July 10, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.