Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Martin Hoffman, against Does 1 - 10, Aldana, Alex, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time230 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Order Determining Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: August 08, 2016Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: July 13, 2016Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: April 21, 2016Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: July 13, 2016Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: May 06, 2016Statement - Other (Addendum to Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption) filed.
Date: July 13, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.