Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Iver Capital Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ali Nabavi, against Does 1 - 10, Buffington, Tina M., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Re: Notice of Intenet to Commence Legal Action) filed.
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 585) filed.
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: May 24, 2017Writ of Execution (Placer) Issued
Date: March 15, 2017Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: June 09, 2016Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 27, 2019Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: June 02, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.