Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Credit Consulting Services Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Macdonald Bryan, against Gonzalez, Emmanuel, Does 1 T0 10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions81 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time707 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: March 11, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: March 11, 2016Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: April 27, 2016Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: November 27, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.