Hamilton, Mckenna,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Raoul M. Thorbourne presiding.
Status Conference - Minors Compromise scheduled for 05/20/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
May 09, 2016
Docket Event
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed.
April 26, 2016
Docket Event
Correspondence (Cover letter re:Corrected Order To Deposit) filed.
April 26, 2016
Docket Event
Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. received from The Superior Court of Sacramento on 04/26/2016.
February 04, 2016
Docket Event
Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
February 04, 2016
Docket Event
Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.
February 04, 2016
Docket Event
Status Conference - Minors Compromise scheduled for 05/06/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .
February 04, 2016
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Granted .
February 04, 2016
Docket Event
Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment For Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) has been Granted .
December 21, 2015
Docket Event
Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment For Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) filed.