Popova, Tatjana,
Bhonsle, Ranjit,
filed a(n)
Malpractice -
Torts
case
against
Sutter Medical Group,
Sutter Health,
Mike Cohen Md,
Jon Gant Md,
Does 1-50,
(total of 5)
See All
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Details for
Popova, Tatjana v. Sutter Medical Group
, et al.
Case Events for
Popova, Tatjana v. Sutter Medical Group
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
June 04, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/07/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: David W. Abbott
May 16, 2018
Docket Event
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
May 15, 2018
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal filed.
May 15, 2018
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
May 15, 2018
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
March 22, 2018
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program heard on 03/22/2018 08:30:00 AM .
March 22, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/07/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause in RE: Non-Compliance has been generated .
Judge: David W. Abbott
March 22, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program rescheduled to 06/07/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: David W. Abbott
March 22, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program continued to 06/07/2018 at 08:30 in this department.
March 22, 2018
Docket Event
Court orders sanctions against Ranjit Bhonsle, Tatjana Popova in the sum of $ 150.00, payable to Court by 04/06/2018. Sanctions imposed for failure to appear.