Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Mitchell Greenberg, against Ryland Mortgage Company, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions94 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time266 days |
Judgment submitted by Bank of America NA rejected on 05/25/2016 .
Date: May 25, 2016Case Management Statement filed.
Date: July 08, 2016Request - Court Judgment filed.
Date: May 12, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: September 09, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.