Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lina M Michael, against Does 1 - 20, Saelee, Kao, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions105 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time111 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: December 18, 2015Statement of Venue filed.
Date: December 18, 2015Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: April 01, 2016Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: February 10, 2016Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: January 06, 2016Summons filed.
Date: December 18, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.