Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Matthew W Quall, against Does 1-100, Maupin, Masako, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions265 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time570 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation for Entry of Judgment and Order Thereon) filed.
Date: September 08, 2016Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: July 10, 2017Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Judgment filed.
Date: September 08, 2016Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: September 06, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: January 13, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.