Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hannah, Jeffrey Andrew, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John N Demas, against Does 2 Through 30, Carroll, Nicholas Mark, Carroll Landscape Contractor, represented by Douglas L Smith, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David De Alba presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid De Alba Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions436 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time437 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: February 23, 2017Answer filed.
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.
Date: 2016-02-09T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2016-03-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.