Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert Scott Kennard, against Does 1 To 10, Xiong, Kia C., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 14, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions267 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time843 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: September 06, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Default denied as to Xiong, Kia C on Complaint .
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: September 06, 2016Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: September 06, 2016Summons filed.
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: April 05, 2018Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: April 25, 2017Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: September 06, 2016Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: October 28, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.