Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pacific Bell Telephone Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Sal J. Munoz, against Arb Inc, Does 1-10, Pacific Gas And Electric Company, represented by Gayle Gough, Kelly J. Lack, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions445 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time496 days |
Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: October 31, 2016Answer filed.
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: November 29, 2016Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: January 19, 2017Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.