We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Case Details

Filing Date

September 04, 2015

Last Refreshed

May 14, 2022

Filing Location

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

David I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Civil - Unlimited

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Construction

Time To Trial

763 days

Time to First Dissmisal Order

577 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Plaintiffs

Defendants

Other Parties

Case Documents

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00

Notice of Entry of Order filed.

Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed.

Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00

Notice of Entry of Order filed.

Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00

Motion to Strike filed.

Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00

Answer filed.

Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00

Answer filed.

Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00

Answer filed.

Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00

Answer (To Cross-Complaint) filed.

Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00

Notice of Entry of Order filed.

Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00

Answer (to Cross Complaint) filed.

Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00

Motion for Leave to Amend filed.

Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00

Answer filed.

Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00

Answer filed.

Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00

Notice of Settlement filed.

Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00

Cross-Complaint filed.

Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00

Motion to Consolidate Cases filed.

Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00

Complaint filed.

Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00

Answer (to Cross Complaint) filed.

Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal filed.

Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00

Case Management Statement filed.

Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00

Summons filed.

Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00

Summons filed.

Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00