Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Matthew W Quall, against Does 1-100, Goodwin, Jane, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions520 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1361 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: March 30, 2017Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Re: Computation of Attorneys' Fees) filed.
Date: December 01, 2016Declaration - Other (Waiver of Security Interest) filed.
Date: December 01, 2016Declaration - Other (CCP 585(d)) filed.
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Waiver of Interest in Excess of 10%) filed.
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: March 30, 2017Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: March 22, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.