Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kevin Berger Trustee Of The Paul H Snider Trust, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kirk E Giberson, against Does 1-10, Sacramento Infiniti Inc, Moes 1-40, Paul H Snider As Trustee For The Snider Family Trust, Snider, Paul H., (total of 5) See All represented by Shawn M Krogh, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Benjamin G. Davidian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin G. Davidian Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions708 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time709 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: June 07, 2017Answer filed.
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: June 08, 2017Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2015-12-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.