Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Martin Hoffman, against Osborne, Robin L., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions67 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time240 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: September 04, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: October 26, 2015Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: September 04, 2015Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: September 04, 2015Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: January 22, 2016Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: February 24, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.