Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by David B Snyder, against Priley, Anthony, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions232 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time742 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: May 31, 2016Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Judgment) filed.
Date: February 16, 2016Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2015-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE CCP 1033 1550 and Interest) filed.
Date: February 16, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Placer) Issued
Date: November 30, 2016Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: May 31, 2016Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: July 10, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.