Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Harlan M Reese, against Cooks, Adrian D., Does 1-10, represented by Larisa K Raymundo, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions322 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Case Cycle Time337 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: May 16, 2016Statement of Venue filed.
Date: June 29, 2015Amended Answer filed.
Date: August 24, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: August 20, 2015Summons filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: July 30, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.