Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Clark, Deveaux, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by William P. Roscoe, against Lube N Go Ltd, Lube >N= Go Ltd, Does 1-10, Abasi, Soleiman, represented by Mitchell L Abdallah, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions354 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time363 days |
Opposition (to Motion to Enforce Settlement Under CCP 664.6) filed.
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2015-01-13T00:00:00Answer submitted by Abasi, Soleiman; Lube >N= Go LTD; Lube N Go LTD rejected on 12/05/2014 .
Date: 2014-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2015-06-01T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: August 10, 2015Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2014-10-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.