Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ortega, Thomas, Ortega, Juanita, Luna, Marcella, Luna, Christina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John E Virga, against Sacramento Regional Transit District, Does 1-50, Alicia M. Musquiz, represented by Timothy S Spangler, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Benjamin G. Davidian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin G. Davidian Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions644 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time655 days |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: May 06, 2016Answer submitted by Sacramento Regional Transit District rejected on 10/27/2014 .
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: April 08, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Answer submitted by Sacramento Regional Transit District; Musquiz, Alicia M rejected on 10/27/2014 .
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: April 25, 2016Answer filed.
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Marcella Luna) filed.
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Juanita Ortega) filed.
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2014-07-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Thomas Ortega) filed.
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Christina Luna) filed.
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2015-05-19T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.