Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Batte, Shameka, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by W Russell Fields, against Does 1 Through 20, Vue, Syla, Yang, Nyo, represented by Kenneth D Harris, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions651 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time671 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2014-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: October 13, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: 2014-04-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: January 14, 2016Summons filed.
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2014-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: November 20, 2015Limited Civil Case Status Memorandum filed.
Date: 2014-11-26T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: August 24, 2015Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 01/16/2015 02:32:00 PM .
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.