Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lobel Financial, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gary Dean Lobel, against Does 1-10, Hethorn, Elsa, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions87 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time227 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: July 23, 2014Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: March 28, 2014Summons filed.
Date: 2014-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: March 28, 2014Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: March 28, 2014Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: July 23, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: August 15, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.