Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Matthew W Quall, against Does 1-100, Koross, Laurence E., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: April 07, 2014Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2014-01-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Regarding Code of Civil Procedure 1033) filed.
Date: April 07, 2014Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2014-04-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Plaintiffs Waiver of Interest) filed.
Date: 2014-04-07T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2014-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2014-02-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Regarding Computation of Attorneys Fees) filed.
Date: 2014-04-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Plaintiffs Waiver of Security Interest) filed.
Date: 2014-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: February 09, 2015Writ of Execution (NAPA) Issued
Date: January 04, 2016Writ of Execution Issued
Date: March 17, 2020Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: July 08, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.