Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Matthew W Quall, against Does 1-100, Wilson, Leslie J., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions87 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1388 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does (Does 1-100) filed.
Date: March 28, 2014Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: October 19, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2014-03-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Regarding Computation Of Attorneys Fees) filed.
Date: March 28, 2014Declaration - Other (Declaration Regarding Code Of Civil Procedure 1033) filed.
Date: March 28, 2014Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Plaintiffs Waiver Of Interest) filed.
Date: March 28, 2014Declaration - Other (Plaintiff's Waiver Of Security Interest) filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2014-01-21T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: May 26, 2017Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: June 05, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.