Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Emily Pierce, against Does 1-25, Dijamatovich, John, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions148 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time471 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 27, 2014Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration RE: Compliance with CCP 1033b2) filed.
Date: May 27, 2014Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: May 27, 2014Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: August 04, 2014Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: April 15, 2015Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: May 27, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.