Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Emily Pierce, against Lee, Deborah, Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions148 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time235 days |
Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: August 22, 2014Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 27, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: May 27, 2014Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 13, 2014Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: May 27, 2014Summons filed.
Date: 2014-01-16T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed. | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Re: Compliance with CCP Section 1033(b)(2); Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed. | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Lee, Deborah on Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) . | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.