Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Emily Pierce, against Stremmel, Carolyn, Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions128 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1383 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 07, 2014Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: October 13, 2017Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: May 07, 2014Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: May 07, 2014Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: August 04, 2016Summons filed.
Date: 2014-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: July 28, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.