Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Emily Pierce, against Martinez, Ramon P., Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1509 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1509 days |
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: June 18, 2014Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: December 30, 2013Statement of Venue filed.
Date: December 30, 2013Request for Dismissal (Entire Action) filed.
Date: February 16, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: January 16, 2014Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: February 20, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.