Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Richard L Mahfouz, Ii, against Veleznoble, Joseph Patrick, Does 1-40, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions80 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Case Cycle Time81 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: December 30, 2013Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: March 20, 2014Summons filed.
Date: January 15, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: December 30, 2013Returned Check Notice (Sacramento) generated .
Date: February 04, 2014Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: February 24, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.