Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Granzella, Kimberly, Deluca, Charlene, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Mark P Velez, against Longs Drug Stores California Llc, Does 1-50, Cvs Pharmacy Inc, A Rhode Island Corporation, represented by Michael G Leggieri, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions890 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time897 days |
Notice - Other (Notice of Peremptory Writ and Remittitur) filed.
Date: December 29, 2015Reply (in Support of Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2014-07-29T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Opposition (to defs Motion for a Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion) filed.
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Statement - Other (Separate Statement in support of Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed.
Date: 2014-01-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) (on Appeal) filed.
Date: January 26, 2016Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: June 07, 20163DCA order issuing alternative writ of mandate
Date: 2014-11-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/25/2014 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/29/2014 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Order - Other (Stip and Order Granting Continuance from 6/11/14 to 6/12/14) filed.
Date: 2014-06-10T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion for a Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2014-07-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/11/2014 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2014-06-11T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Foreign Authorities in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement) filed.
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/12/2014 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2014-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2014-06-02T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Order - Other (Stip and Order to Stay Proceedings) filed.
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/05/2014 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2014-08-05T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2014-05-14T00:00:003DCA Peremptory Writ of Mandate and Remittitur
Date: December 18, 2015Notice of Entry - Other (Order) filed.
Date: June 14, 2016Stipulation and Order filed.
Date: 2014-09-17T00:00:00Peremptory Writ of Mandate and Remittitur Updated - Costs Posted
Date: February 29, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2014-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2014-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Michael G Leggieri) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2014-05-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery filed.
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-05-15T00:00:00Order - Other (Stip and Order Continuing Hearings from 6/11/14 to 6/12/14) filed.
Date: 2014-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Mark P Velez) filed.
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2014-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-07-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Michael G Leggieri) filed.
Date: June 06, 2016Proof of Service filed.
Date: June 14, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.