Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rankin, Douglas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jesse S Atwal, Kenneth D Harris, against Does 1-10, Prince, Stacy, represented by Kenneth D Harris, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions665 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time706 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: June 04, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-02-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit submitted by Prince, Stacy rejected on 12/23/2013 .
Date: 2013-12-23T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2013-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2014-07-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: May 28, 2015Association of Attorney filed.
Date: March 13, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.