Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Zurich American Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Shelly Hay Anderson, against Hazdi Antich, Theodore, Hazdi Antich, Nina, represented by Gareth Umipeg, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions507 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time523 days |
Notice - Other (of filing subrogation complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-08-26T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-07-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: November 24, 2014Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-07-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-07-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2013-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: March 03, 2014Notice of Lien filed.
Date: 2014-01-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.