Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Inland Valley Development Agency, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against State Of California Department Of Finance, San Bernardino County Auditor Controller Tax Collector Larry Walker, Does 1-100, California Director Of Finance Ana J Matosantos, Califorinia State Controller John Chiang, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Timothy M. Frawley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy M. Frawley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions437 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1610 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: February 27, 2014Opposition filed.
Date: May 01, 2017Order - Other (RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) filed.
Date: May 26, 2017Answer filed.
Date: February 05, 2013Notice of Case Assignment Sac generated .
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: February 25, 2013Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: March 10, 2014Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: April 21, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.