Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ryan E Vos, against Does 1-10, Constant, Shauna, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions143 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time954 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 23, 2013Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: August 12, 2015Declaration - Other filed.
Date: May 23, 2013Summons filed.
Date: 2013-01-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2013-03-13T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Los Angeles County) Issued
Date: January 24, 2014Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: January 27, 2014Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: February 10, 2015Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: February 09, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.