Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Redd, Cheryl, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John T Stralen, against Does 1-25, Chavez, Cangela, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael G. Virga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael G. Virga Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions419 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time426 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 20, 2014Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: February 10, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.