Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bizallion, James, Bizallion, Cindy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Edward A Smith, against Steel, Julianna, Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time1931 days |
Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: 2013-02-07T00:00:00Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: May 12, 2017Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00NOTICE AND ORDER UNINSURED MOTORIST ACTIONS generated .
Date: 2015-02-26T00:00:00Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: 2013-09-27T00:00:00Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: October 23, 2017Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: 2014-03-04T00:00:00Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: April 12, 2018Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Statement - Other (of Non Opposition to Motion to Compel Arb) filed.
Date: April 17, 2017Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: December 07, 2016Uninsured Motorist Statement filed.
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Summons submitted by Bizallion, James; Bizallion, Cindy rejected on 01/30/2013 .
Date: 2013-01-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.