Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jonathan P Sibayan, against Does 1-10, Gosal, Gurmukh, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions130 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time660 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: June 26, 2014Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: May 10, 2013Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: March 03, 2014Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: January 15, 2014Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: May 10, 2013Abstract of Judgment submitted by American Express Bank FSB rejected on 11/19/2013 .
Date: November 19, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 21, 2014Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2013-05-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-01-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed.
Date: October 22, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.