Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Johnson, Nicole, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Department Of Industrial Relations, against Khanna, Ravi, Khanna, Raj, Khanna Enterprises Ltd, Khanna Enterprises Ii, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond M. Cadei Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time570 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: July 24, 2014Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: July 16, 2014Labor Board Judgment - Request for and Entry of filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: May 05, 2014Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: January 28, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: May 05, 2014Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: May 05, 2014Writ of Execution (LA) Issued
Date: May 05, 2014Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: January 28, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.