Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fia Card Services Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Anita H Singh, against Tenazas, Audines L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time582 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: April 29, 2013Declaration - Other (RE Interest, Costs, Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: April 29, 2013Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-01-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: April 29, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: October 31, 2013Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: November 22, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: August 05, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.