We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Julia Casillas Vs. Cindy Mcconnell

Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago ago

On November 06, 2012 a Pi/Pd/Wd - Auto case was filed by Casillas, Julia, represented by Nicholas Anderson, against Does 1-25, Mcconnell, Cindy, Mcconnell, Daniel S., represented by Jeffrey M. Schaff, Shiela F Gonzales, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.

Case Details

Filing Date

November 06, 2012

Last Refreshed

December 02, 2021

Filing Location

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Michael G. Virga Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Civil - Unlimited

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Automobile

Case Cycle Time

819 days

Time to First Dissmisal Order

808 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 02/24/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .

Judge: Michael G. Virga

Docket Event Case assigned to Department 36 .

Judge: Gerrit W. Wood

Hearing Case Management Conference - Case Management Program
Heard

Judge: Gerrit W. Wood

Docket Event Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 02/24/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

Judge: Michael G. Virga

Docket Event Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 03/17/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

Judge: Michael G. Virga

Docket Event Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/09/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Judge: Gerrit W. Wood

Docket Event Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 10/27/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

Judge: Robert C. Hight

Docket Event Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 09/18/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

Judge: Robert C. Hight

Docket Event Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Docket Event Case Management Statement filed.
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.