Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Warren, Kim, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by William E Thompson, against Thyfault, Cynthia, Does 1-20, represented by Julio A Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Laurie M. Earl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurie M. Earl Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions413 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time491 days |
Stipulation for Settlement; Order
Date: March 07, 2013Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: July 23, 2013Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: May 06, 2013Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed.
Date: 2012-05-04T00:00:00General Denial filed.
Date: 2012-05-21T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2012-05-04T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-05-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2012-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2013-03-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.