Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carrillo-Rodriguez, Ana, Briseno, Bryan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by W Russell Fields, against Prigley, James, Does 1-20, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions85 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time85 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: April 19, 2012Complaint filed.
Date: January 25, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: March 21, 2012Summons filed.
Date: February 01, 2012Declaration - Other (of W Russell Fields) filed.
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: January 26, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.