Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Casey M Jensen, against Does 1-10, Hall, Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Stephen P. Acquisto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen P. Acquisto Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions196 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2875 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: July 13, 2012Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: November 13, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2012-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2012-07-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Interest) filed.
Date: 2012-07-13T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2012-07-13T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2012-07-13T00:00:00Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: February 06, 2015Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 06, 2017Declaration - Other (RE Underlying Action of Account Stated) filed.
Date: 2012-07-13T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: October 31, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.