Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Td Auto Finance Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Todd A Macdowell, against Does 1-10, Andrews, James A., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1081 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1461 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: November 10, 2015Application - Other (Amendment to Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc) filed.
Date: November 30, 2015Order - Other filed.
Date: December 30, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: November 10, 2015Declaration - Other (for Use of Documents) filed.
Date: December 15, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: December 15, 2014Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: 2014-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2012-03-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of David T Chen) filed.
Date: December 28, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.