We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Mendoza, Gericka Lyd Martinez ,
filed a(n)
(Other Civil Petition)
case
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
Superior with Ernest W. Sawtelle presiding.
Filing Date
December 30, 2011
Category
(Other Civil Petition)
Last Refreshed
March 29, 2024
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Plaintiffs
Mendoza, Gericka Lyd Martinez
Other Parties
Mendoza, Gina (Guardian Ad Litem Cr)
Timothy Pomykala (Attorney)
Case Events for
Mendoza, Gericka Lyd Martinez v.
Date
Type
Description
March 14, 2012
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account Document
March 14, 2012
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed. Filed By: Mendoza, Gericka Lyd Martinez (Petitioner) Document
March 14, 2012
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account Mendoza, Gericka Lyd Martinez (Petitioner)
March 14, 2012
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed. Document
March 14, 2012
Docket Event
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed.
Get Document
February 17, 2012
Case disposed with disposition of Granted . Disposition
February 17, 2012
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Granted .
February 10, 2012
Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability Document
February 10, 2012
Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account Document
February 10, 2012
Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment For Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) has been Granted . Disposition
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.