Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brockett, Lloyd, Chavez, Dalia, Cox, Cathy, Gimelli, Greg, Gimelli, Helena, (total of 11) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Teresa A. Libertino, against Does 1-1000, Meritage Homes Of California Inc, Roes 1-700, represented by Edward R Hugenin, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time962 days |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: August 18, 2014Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-04-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: January 18, 2013Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-06-20T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-04-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: August 12, 2014Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-04-13T00:00:00Non-Opposition filed.
Date: 2012-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: May 09, 2013Motion to Compel - Other (Verified Responses to Requests for Production of Documents) filed.
Date: 2012-11-30T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-06-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-04-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2012-03-13T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2012-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2012-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2012-11-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.