We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Tina Tran Vs. Elliott Homes Inc

Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago ago

On November 01, 2011 a Contract - Other case was filed by Chon, Sun, Smith, Karen, Tran, Tina, represented by Teresa A. Libertino, against Does 1 - 1000, Elliott Homes Inc, represented by in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.

Case Details

Filing Date

November 01, 2011

Last Refreshed

May 13, 2022

Filing Location

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

David W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Civil - Unlimited

Practice Area

Commercial

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Case Cycle Time

205 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event 34-2011-00113359-CU-CO-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2011-00104644-CU-BC-GDS on 05/24/2012 .
Docket Event Case Management Conference - Case Management Program rescheduled to 08/02/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

Judge: David W. Abbott

Docket Event Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/02/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Judge: David W. Abbott

Docket Event Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 05/10/2012 08:30:00 AM .
Docket Event Case Management Conference - Case Management Program continued to 08/02/2012 at 08:30 in this department.
Docket Event Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/10/2012 08:30:00 AM published .
Tentative Ruling No appearance is required under the following conditions: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program continued to 08/02/2012 at 08:30 in this department. New Case Management Statements shall...
Docket Event Case Management Statement filed.
Docket Event Motion to Consolidate Cases submitted by Tran, Tina rejected on 04/12/2012 .
Docket Event Motion to Consolidate Cases filed.
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.