Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Service Partners Supply Llc, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Stephen C Tedesco, against Does 1-100, Franco, Ricardo, Insulation Distributors Inc, represented by Tory E Griffin, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions200 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time521 days |
Stipulation (For Entry Of Permanent Injunction) filed.
Date: April 02, 2012Objection filed.
Date: 2011-11-04T00:00:00Motion - Other (to seal submission by both parties re osc) filed.
Date: 2011-11-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/16/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-02-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/28/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-02-28T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-10-14T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2011-11-04T00:00:003DCA remittitur issued, appeal is dismissed
Date: April 23, 2012Opposition (to Motion to stay enforcement of the preliminary injunction pending appeal) filed.
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/30/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Response (to defs evidentiary objections) filed.
Date: 2011-11-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-01-24T00:00:00Notice Designating of Record on Appeal
Date: 2012-02-03T00:00:00Motion - Other (Stay Enforcement of Prelim Inj) filed.
Date: 2012-01-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for TRO/OSC re:preliminary injunction) filed.
Date: 2011-10-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Ricardo Franco in opposition to TRO/OSC) filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Stipulated Protective order) filed.
Date: 2011-12-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-10-17T00:00:00Reply filed.
Date: 2011-12-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (supplemental) filed.
Date: 2011-10-24T00:00:003DCA Appeal not Selected Notice
Date: 2012-03-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2011-10-17T00:00:00Motion - Other (to seal submissions by pltf) filed.
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/21/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-01-24T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2012-02-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of W Ruprecht in opposition) filed.
Date: 2011-11-04T00:00:00Opposition (to TRO/OSC RE: Preliminary Injunction) filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2011-12-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-11-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/13/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-13T00:00:00Order - Other (Permanent Injunction and Judgment) filed.
Date: May 01, 2012Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/16/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-11-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Christopher M Novogratz in opposition to TRO/OSC) filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of E R Ostrem in support) filed.
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-12-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of E R Ostrem in support) filed.
Date: 2011-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Reply (Brief in support of order to show cause re preliminary injunction) filed.
Date: 2011-11-09T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-10-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-10-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for expedited Discovery) filed.
Date: 2011-10-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Customer B redacted) filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-10-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Customer A redacted copy) filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Customer C) filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Tory GRiffin in opposition to motion for expedited discovery) filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte for expedited discovery) filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Order - Other (Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction) filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-10-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (supplemental) filed.
Date: 2011-10-24T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (appendix of non ca authority) filed.
Date: 2011-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (supplemental) filed.
Date: 2011-11-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2011-11-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (John Garland in RE reports of electronic device inventories) filed.
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2011-11-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Bryan Koehn) filed.
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (Plaintiffs Notice Of Non-Receipt Of Opposition To Motion) filed.
Date: 2011-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-11-16T00:00:00Order - Other (Continuance Request - Granted (Motion continued from 11/21/11 to 11/30/11)) filed.
Date: 2011-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Stipulated Protective ORder) filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of R Franco in oppositon) filed.
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-11-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 12/29/2011 04:18:00 PM .
Date: 2011-12-29T00:00:00Undertaking filed.
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Order After Hearing (Order Following Hearing on Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction) filed.
Date: 2012-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Non-Availability of Register of Actions
Date: 2012-02-06T00:00:00Order - Other (Continuance Request - Granted (Motion continued from 2/28/12 to 3/13/120) filed.
Date: 2012-02-22T00:00:00Order - Other (Continuance Request - Granted (Motion continued from 3/13/12 to 3/28/12)) filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: March 28, 2012Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: February 11, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.