Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Centex Homes, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anne J Kelley, against Ace American Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, American Safety Indemnity Company, American Zurich Insurance Company, (total of 62) See All represented by A Eric Aguilera, Darryl M Yee, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin R. Culhane Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial1056 days |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1190 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1300 days |
Joinder in Motion (to Sever) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Appendix of Exhibits in support of Centex Homes' Opp to Travelers MSJ) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Traveler's Motion for Partial Judgment) filed.
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Statement - Other (Centex's (Proposed) Statement of the Case) filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of C Kendie Schlecht in Support of Motion to Tax/Strike Costs) filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike or Tax Costs filed.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 08/31/2016 09:30:00 AM published .
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Statement - Other (of Non-Opposition to Motion to Stay) filed.
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Joinder in Motion filed.
Date: 2013-06-04T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2014-02-03T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Juror Request (Juror Request No. 3..5/1/15) filed.
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Juror Request (Juror Request #4) filed.
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Amended Ex Parte App for Order Permitting Additional Pages) filed.
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 03/15/2017 09:30:00 AM published .
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Joinder in Opposition (re: Demurrer (Interstate Fire & Casulaty Co)) filed.
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike or Tax Costs filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion for Partial New Trial) filed.
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Rondi J. Walsh ISO of Centex's Motion to Tax or Strike Costs) filed.
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 09/08/2016 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Motion - Other (Travelers' Ntc of Mtn and Mtn to Stay) filed.
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Proposed Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed.
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Reply (Brief) filed.
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Objection filed.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Errata (Regarding Opposition) filed.
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Proposed Order filed.
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Answer (to Cross Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Errata (to Request for Judicial Notice) filed.
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Motion for Severance filed.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2013-02-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Partial New Trial) filed.
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Anne J Kelley in Support of Motion to Tax/Strike Costs) filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Trial Brief (Centex's Brief regarding imputation of Attorney's conduct to client) filed.
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/15/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2014-10-31T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2014-05-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/28/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Answer ((Certain)Underwriters At Lloyd's London's Answer to Second Amended Cross Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-01-17T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Juror Request (Juror Request No. 1...5/1/15) filed.
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2014-08-28T00:00:00Objection (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-02-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00Joinder in Motion filed.
Date: 2013-06-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-06-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2013-09-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/23/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-10-23T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Requesting Preparation of Omitted Portions of Record) filed.
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/15/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Request - Statement of Decision filed.
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Joinder in Opposition (re: Demurrer (Navigators Ins Co)) filed.
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Trial Brief (Travelers' Trial Brief) filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Statement - Other (in Support) filed.
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Reply Brief) filed.
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration) filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed.
Date: 2014-09-17T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2014-05-30T00:00:00Statement - Other (separate) filed.
Date: 2014-05-30T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration in Support of Reply in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2014-01-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in support of Motion of Jugment on the Pleadings) filed.
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Matthew K McCullough in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Motion - Other (Centex Homes' Motion for Nonsuit as to second Amended Cross-Complaint Travelers') filed.
Date: 2015-04-13T00:00:00Juror Request (Juror Request No. 2...5/1/15) filed.
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-06-05T00:00:00Stipulation (Authentication of Documents) filed.
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Award of Prejudgment Interest) filed.
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for Order Permitting Additional Pages for Post-Trial Biefing) filed.
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Answer (2nd AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) filed.
Date: 2014-04-11T00:00:00Opposition (Travelers' Opposition to Centex's Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict) filed.
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 06/01/2016 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Motion for Partial New Trial) filed.
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other filed.
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Trial Brief (Centex Homes' Trial Brief regarding Date on which the duty to defend ends) filed.
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Statement - Other (in Opposition) filed.
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Statement - Other (in Support) filed.
Date: 2013-05-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Reply to Opposition) filed.
Date: 2012-08-08T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Answer (to Second Amended Cross Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-08-18T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-10-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Reply) filed.
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00Objection filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Order - Other (Referee's Report and Order) filed.
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Order - Other (Notice of Assignment to Department 35 for Complex Case Management Determination) filed.
Date: 2013-07-24T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion for Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed.
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/10/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-02-10T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2013-08-09T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Brandon Clouse) filed.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Objection (to Travelers Evidence Submitted in Opposition to plfs Reply) filed.
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Minute Order) filed.
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00Correspondence (Re: Request of Court to Sign Order) filed.
Date: 2013-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-02-06T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-09-24T00:00:00Order - Other (Referee's Report and Order) filed.
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of a.Kelley In Support of Motion for Judgment) filed.
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum in support of Mot/Sever) filed.
Date: 2014-08-08T00:00:00Trial Brief (Trial Brief Re: The Date Travelers' Duty to defend ceased) filed.
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 08/21/2013 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 08/13/2014 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2014-08-13T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication filed.
Date: 2014-05-30T00:00:00Joinder in Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2013-09-30T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Joinder in Motion filed.
Date: 2014-08-06T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order filed.
Date: 2013-08-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed.
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Centex Homes' Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time) filed.
Date: 2013-08-09T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 09/08/2016 02:00:00 PM published .
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Request - Other (GRANTED Request to Appear by Telephone at MSC) filed.
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Objection (Referee's Report & Order) filed.
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00Trial Brief (Centex Homes' Trial Brief Regarding Travelers' 4th and 9th Causes of Action) filed.
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00Proposed Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Objection filed.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Proposed Order (Granting Travelers defs Pro Hac Vice Application of Thomas Lether) filed.
Date: 2014-09-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (to Transfer Trial to Department 35) filed.
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary objection of Centex Homes) filed.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-09-12T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-08-02T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Order - Other (Minute Order) filed.
Date: 2015-04-13T00:00:00Objection (Objection of Centex Homes to Tentative decision and request for oral argument) filed.
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of G C Mills in support) filed.
Date: 2012-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Court's Consideration of and ruling on referee's Report and order
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Trial Brief (Travelers' Trial Brief Re Independent counsel) filed.
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Travelers Mot/Partial Judgment) filed.
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (To Motion to tax) filed.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Motion for Non-Suit filed.
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts) filed.
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Stipulation Only - Other (Stipulation of uncontested facts regarding other Insurers) filed.
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Reply filed.
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2014-07-22T00:00:00Statement - Other (separate) filed.
Date: 2012-07-16T00:00:00Answer submitted by Ad Land Venture, a California limited partnership rejected on 02/01/2012 .
Date: 2012-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 07/28/2016 10:30:00 AM published .
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Answer (To First Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Stipulation (Stipulation of Facts in Lieu of Testimony of A. Eric Aguilera) filed.
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (of order remanding case to sac county superior court) filed.
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for an Order to Amend Court Order OR for OST) filed.
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order filed.
Date: 2012-07-16T00:00:00Answer (2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) filed.
Date: 2014-04-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Page Limitation) filed.
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2013-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Appeal (Defendant)
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Reply (Brief) filed.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Responses to Req for Prod of Docs) filed.
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Reply (in support of its Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Deem Facts Admitted filed.
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Objection (to Notice of Failure to Oppose Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2014-01-15T00:00:00Joinder in Motion (in Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time) filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Reply filed.
Date: 2014-01-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Support of Motion for Judgment) filed.
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2015-06-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication filed.
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Reply filed.
Date: 2013-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Centex Homes's Bench brief regarding Travelers' unfounded affirmative defense for mitigation of damages
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Order - Other (Referee's Report and Order) filed.
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2013-06-26T00:00:00Tentative Decision on Phase III Issues
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Non-Opposition (Joinder) filed.
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed.
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order filed.
Date: 2013-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary objection of Centex Homes to declarartion) filed.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application For Continuance filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order filed.
Date: 2013-10-08T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-10-03T00:00:00Motion - Other (To Move for Partial new Trial) filed.
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Reply Brief) filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Trial Brief (Centex's Closing Brief for October 2015 Trial) filed.
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Objection (to Referee's Report & Proposed Order) filed.
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Joinder in Motion (Interstate Fire & Casualty Co) filed.
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed.
Date: 2014-09-10T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-06-19T00:00:00Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice filed.
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2014-07-28T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Motion For Summary Adjudication) filed.
Date: 2014-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2014-07-28T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed.
Date: 2015-01-09T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Vacate MSC) filed.
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Opposition (Oppositionj to Centex's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings) filed.
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (to centex Homes re: MSJ) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 08/31/2016 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/21/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2013-05-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support) filed.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Trial Brief (Travelers' Trial Brief Regarding Remaining Issues to be Resolved by the Court) filed.
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Motion for Clarafication and reonsideration regarding plfs Motion for SA) filed.
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike or Tax Costs filed.
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Notice - Other (of non-opposition to ex-parte) filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Order Sustaining Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2014-01-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2013-07-02T00:00:003DCA Appeal not Selected Notice
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Bench Brief Re WIlson Vs. 21st Century INS. Co., 42 Cal4th 713(2007)
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Reply Brief) filed.
Date: 2012-08-08T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Not Withstanding the Verdict filed.
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Stipulation of uncontested facts regarding financial condition of the travelers companies, Inc.
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Opposition (to MSJ) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2013-10-02T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 08/13/2014 09:30:00 AM published .
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Notice - Other (Traveleres's request for Judicail Notice in suppor of motion in Limine) filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Objection filed.
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00Stipulation (Stipulation of facts in Lieu of Testimony of Jessica Simonson Drew and Linda Aranda) filed.
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed.
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 03/15/2017 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended Compalint) filed.
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed.
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support) filed.
Date: 2013-05-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support) filed.
Date: 2013-05-10T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-10-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-02-11T00:00:00Trial Brief (Centex's Trial Brief Re Independent counsel) filed.
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Reply Brief) filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed.
Date: 2015-01-09T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-06-04T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2014-07-14T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 08/21/2013 09:30:00 AM published .
Date: 2013-08-20T00:00:00Bench Brief Re State V. Pacific Indemity Co., 63 Cal ..APP 4th 1535 (1998)
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Summons (on Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Rondi Walsh) filed.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2012-07-06T00:00:00Answer (to Cross Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00Correspondence (Correspondence Re: Trial Brief) filed.
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00Joinder in Opposition (re: Demurrer (Hartford Casualty Ins Co)) filed.
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-05-14T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Appendix of Exhibits in support of Centex Homes Opp to Travelers Two MSJ) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Responses to Special Interrogs; Form Interrogs) filed.
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed.
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration filed.
Date: 2013-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-06-04T00:00:00Statement - Other (of Decision Regarding Trial) filed.
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2013-06-10T00:00:00Objection (in Reply to Separate Statement) filed.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/24/2013 03:39:00 PM .
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Errata (Regarding Opposition) filed.
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Joinder in Opposition (Re: Demurrer (Colony National Ins Co)) filed.
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2013-10-25T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed.
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support) filed.
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Strike (Portions of Centex's First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/05/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-12-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of James R Tenero in Support of Ex Parte Application for OST) filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Order - Other (Centex-Travelers Final Statement of Decision) filed.
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Objection (Referee Report) filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order filed.
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Joinder in Opposition (re: Demurrer (Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London)) filed.
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00Bench Brief Re Enforceability of scope of work releases between travelers and Milstein Law Firm
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Reply (to stipulated Motion to vacate MSC and Trial) filed.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2013-08-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2012-08-02T00:00:00Reply (Brief for its Motion Seeking a Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2012-08-08T00:00:00Response (to Seprate Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2012-08-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other filed.
Date: 2013-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Bench Brief Re Parol Evidence
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of C. Kendie Schlecht ISO of Centex's Motion to Tax or Strike Costs) filed.
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Statement - Other (in Support) filed.
Date: 2013-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Ex Parte Application for OST) filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-05-31T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:003DCA order reinstating appeal
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint (First) filed.
Date: 2014-02-03T00:00:00Summons (on First Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-03-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Anne J. Kelley ISO of Centex's Motion to Tax or Strike Costs) filed.
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Trial Brief (Centex Homes' Brief regarding an Insurer's immediate defense obligation) filed.
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Anne J Kelley in Support of its Opp) filed.
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Reply (Brief) filed.
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Minute Order) filed.
Date: 2014-03-06T00:00:00Order - Other (Re: Post-Trial Briefs) filed.
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Reply (Brief in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Set MSC) filed.
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Joinder in Motion filed.
Date: 2013-05-31T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2013-06-28T00:00:003DCA Appeal not Selected Notice
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Rondi J Walsh in Support of Motion to Tax/Strike Costs) filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Minute Order) filed.
Date: 2013-10-29T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 06/01/2016 09:30:00 AM published .
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Reply (Brief) filed.
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-09-19T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts (Additional) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Joinder in Motion filed.
Date: 2014-07-22T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2014-08-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Reply (Brief in support of Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2013-10-04T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Correspondence (Re: Refund Request) filed.
Date: 2013-12-12T00:00:00Answer (Centex Homes' Answer to 2nd Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-18T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Answer (To Second Amended Cross-Complaint of StPaul Mercury) filed.
Date: 2014-03-10T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-26T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2013-10-21T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Minute Order) filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Motion) filed.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Bench Brief Re Novak V. Low, Ball & Lynch 77 Cal ..App. 4th 278 (1999)
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/17/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-10-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Travelers' list of disputed motions in Limine pursuant to) filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Order - Other (Reassignment for all Purposes) filed.
Date: 2014-08-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Raymond E Brown in Support of Motion for Partial New Trial) filed.
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of A.Kelley in support of Opposition) filed.
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Motion - Other (For Partial Verdict) filed.
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-09-13T00:00:00Statement - Other (Separate Statement) filed.
Date: 2013-09-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2013-02-28T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/17/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Joinder in Motion filed.
Date: 2014-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Anne Kelley) filed.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Objection filed.
Date: 2015-03-10T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Objection (Centex Homes' Objections to Proposed Statement of Decision on Phase III Issues) filed.
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Joinder in Motion filed.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Minute Order) filed.
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Ex Parte Application for OST) filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order - Other (Regarding the Substitution/Answer of Zurich American Insurance Co) filed.
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (to File First Amended Complaint and First Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-12-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2013-07-03T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion Summary Adj re Right to Control) filed.
Date: 2014-08-08T00:00:00Statement of Decision ((Proposed)) filed.
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed.
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (Joinder in Ex Parte Application for OST) filed.
Date: 2014-08-28T00:00:00Trial Brief (Centex Homes' Trial Brief) filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Trial Brief (Centex Home's Trial Brief Regarding Travelers' 4th and 9th Causes of Action) filed.
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Demurrer (to 1st amended x-complaint of St Paul Mercury Ins Co;memo of points and authorities) filed.
Date: 2013-06-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Centex Homes' List of disputed Motions in Limine) filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (to strike portions of centex HOmes 1st amended complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Reply (to Objection to Notice of Failure to Oppose Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Notice - Other (NOtice of Withdrawal of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed.
Date: 2013-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application) filed.
Date: 2014-08-18T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed.
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2014-07-24T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint (Second) filed.
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2013-11-08T00:00:00Objection (in opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed.
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Response (to Motion to Stay) filed.
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-06-11T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-05-17T00:00:00Statement - Other filed.
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-06-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-10-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.
Date: 2011-11-02T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Removal to Adverse Party) filed.
Date: 2011-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2012-06-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of M Jarrett Coleman) filed.
Date: 2012-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2012-07-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kari Myron) filed.
Date: 2012-08-02T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2012-09-13T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice Of Case Management Conference) filed.
Date: 2012-08-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Request - Media Coverage filed.
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (copies) filed.
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-02-28T00:00:00Demurrer (to First Amended Cross-Complaint of St Paul Mercury) filed.
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Objection (Centex Homes' Objections to Travelers' May 17, 2016 Proposed Judgment) filed.
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Reply (Reply on Motion for Award of Prejudgment Interest) filed.
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of C. Kendie) filed.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2013-02-28T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Leave to File First Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2012-12-21T00:00:00Objection (to Declarations Offered in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: 2012-08-10T00:00:00Motion - Other (Pre-Assign for Trial) filed.
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (To Centex's Motion for Judgment) filed.
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Opposition (Travelers' Opposition to Centex Homes' Motion to Tax or Strike Costs) filed.
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kendall True in support) filed.
Date: 2012-07-16T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary - in Support of its Reply Brief) filed.
Date: 2012-08-08T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed.
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: 2014-06-04T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to Motion for Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Joinder in Opposition (re: Demurrer (American Safety Indemnity Co)) filed.
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal (Travelers)
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-01-30T00:00:00Demurrer (to First Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion for prejudgment interest) filed.
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Local Rule 1.06(D) Regarding Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed.
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Determining Disposition Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Order Granting Travelers Defendant's Pro Hac Vice Application of Thomas Lether
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set 1) filed.
Date: 2013-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed.
Date: 2013-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2013-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2013-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-10-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Richard W. Protzmann) filed.
Date: 2013-10-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Graham C. Mills) filed.
Date: 2013-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: 2013-10-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 10/10/2013 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (Re: Bender's Motion for Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Raymond E Brown) filed.
Date: 2013-10-25T00:00:00Correspondence (Leter re: Discovery Referee Request) filed.
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re: Complex Case Fees) filed.
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Posting Complex Fees) filed.
Date: 2013-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-10-29T00:00:00Notice - Other (Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London's Notice of Posting Complex Case Fees) filed.
Date: 2013-10-29T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Re: Complex Case Fees) filed.
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Depositing Complex Fees) filed.
Date: 2013-10-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 11/06/2013 08:40:00 AM .
Date: 2013-11-06T00:00:00Notice - Other (Centex Homes' Notice of Posting of Complex Case Fees) filed.
Date: 2013-11-06T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Posting Complex Case Fees) filed.
Date: 2013-10-31T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2013-11-06T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Posting Complex Case Fees) filed.
Date: 2013-10-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Graham C Mills) filed.
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Trial and Settlement Conference Dates) filed.
Date: 2013-11-13T00:00:00Correspondence (Consent and Certification for Discovery Referee Hon. Brian Van Camp) filed.
Date: 2013-11-19T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Continuing Hearing Dates) filed.
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 11/21/2013 10:56:00 AM .
Date: 2013-11-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2013-11-21T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Complex Case Fees) filed.
Date: 2013-11-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Responses to Discovery without Objections) filed.
Date: 2013-12-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jennifer Elowsky) filed.
Date: 2013-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-12-19T00:00:00Order - Other (Discovery Order No. 1) filed.
Date: 2013-12-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2014-01-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Graham C Mills) filed.
Date: 2014-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00Notice - Other filed.
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Charuni Patibanda) filed.
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2014-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (Certificate of Service) filed.
Date: 2014-01-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 01/24/2014 02:33:00 PM .
Date: 2014-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Complex heard on 02/28/2014 03:00:00 PM .
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Answer (StarNet Insurance Company's Answer to 2nd Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-18T00:00:00Answer (Colony National Insurance Company's Answer to 1st Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-19T00:00:00Answer (Arch Speciality Insurance Company's Answer to 2nd Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-20T00:00:00Answer (Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company's Answer to Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Answer (Colony National Insurance Company's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Answer (Everest National Insurance Company's Answer to Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Answer (Zurich American Insurance Company's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Answer (Steadfast Insurance Company's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Answer (Northern Insurance Company's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Answer (Assurance Company of America's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Answer (American Zurich Insurance Company's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Answer (Maryland Casualty Company's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Answer (Old Republic Insurance Company's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-04-11T00:00:00Answer (Aspen Specialty Insurance Company's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2014-03-26T00:00:00Answer (American Safety Indemnity Company's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-04-02T00:00:00Answer (Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company's Answer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2014-05-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Caroline Peros) filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Index of Evidence) filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-06-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of John Tolman) filed.
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Scott W. Glassmoyer) filed.
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Graham C. Mills) filed.
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Non-California Cases) filed.
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jolynn M Pollard) filed.
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed.
Date: 2013-07-23T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2013-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Continue Trial and Mandatory Settlement) filed.
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Depositions) filed.
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Andrew B Downs) filed.
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Richard Carrillo) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Antony Vandermoore) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Compendium of Non California Cases) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of A. Erica Aguilera) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Mark Pragin) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Martel Lopez) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (of Non California Cases) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Raymond E Brown) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of F Adelman) filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Graham C Mills) filed.
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2013-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2013-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-09-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Graham C. Mills) filed.
Date: 2013-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-09-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Graham C Mills) filed.
Date: 2013-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-09-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Graham C Mills) filed.
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Depositions) filed.
Date: 2013-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2013-09-27T00:00:00Notice - Other (of withdrawal of MOtion to compel deposition of the Milstein Adelman firm) filed.
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Carolene Peros) filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Timothy P Lindell) filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Steve Lokus) filed.
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2014-06-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Complex heard on 06/19/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-06-19T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2014-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of A Vandermoore) filed.
Date: 2014-05-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of R Carrillo) filed.
Date: 2014-05-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of N P Carrigan) filed.
Date: 2014-05-30T00:00:00Statement - Other (Certificate of Service) filed.
Date: 2014-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Joinder in Motion (to Sever, or in the Alternative, to Continue Trial) filed.
Date: 2014-07-22T00:00:00Joinder in Motion ((Old Republic Insurance Company)) filed.
Date: 2014-07-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Charles D. Henderson) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Joseph A. Ferrentino) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Anne J. Kelley) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jarrett Coleman) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (Electronic) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Joinder in Motion submitted by American Safety Indemnity Company rejected on 08/04/2014 .
Date: 2014-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (Certificate Of Service) filed.
Date: 2014-08-08T00:00:00Order After Hearing filed.
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Joinder in Motion (to Sever or in the Alternative to Continue Trial) filed.
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Joinder to Ex Perte) filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Joinder in Motion (to Ex Parte to Sever and Continue Trial on the Severed Causes of Action Only) filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 09/02/2014 01:30:00 PM .
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Correspondence (Returned Mail) filed.
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2014-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other filed.
Date: 2014-09-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Re: Special Interrogatories) filed.
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2013-06-11T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing (on Demurrer to First Amended Cross-Complaint of St Paul Mercury) filed.
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 01/24/2014 02:52:00 PM .
Date: 2014-01-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 01/24/2014 03:06:00 PM .
Date: 2014-01-24T00:00:00Order - Other (Referee's Report and Order for Protective Order to Continue Depositions) filed.
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (Proof of Service of Refere's Report and Order) filed.
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2013-12-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (Re: Motions) filed.
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice to Drop Hearings of 10/15/2014 at 9:00 a.m. D54) filed.
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial) submitted by Centex Homes rejected on 10/22/2014 .
Date: 2014-10-22T00:00:00Response (to ExParte Motion to Continue Trial) filed.
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Andrew B Downs) filed.
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (to Continue Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference Dates) filed.
Date: 2014-10-31T00:00:00Order to Continue trial and mandatory settlement conference dates
Date: 2014-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2014-11-04T00:00:00Certificate of Service by Mailing
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2015-01-09T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2015-01-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of Nicholas Carrigan) filed.
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 01/21/2015 11:43:00 AM .
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Exhibit List (Centex Homes' Exhibit List) filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/04/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/05/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Exhibit List (Centex Homes' Exhibit List) filed.
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Service
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Exhibit List (Travelers' Exhibit List) filed.
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Exhibit List (Travelers' Exhibit List (Amended as of 2/10/15)) filed.
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Service
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/09/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/10/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Centex Homes' (Proposed)Jury Instructions
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/11/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-02-11T00:00:00Stipulated facts
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Centex Homes' (Proposed) Additional Special Jury Instructions
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/17/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/18/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-02-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/20/2015 11:30:00 AM .
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 03/16/2015 10:49:00 AM .
Date: 2015-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00COURTS'S RULING FOLLOWING COURT TRIAL WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAILING
Date: 2015-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 04/02/2015 02:30:00 PM .
Date: 2015-04-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 04/06/2015 01:54:00 PM .
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Traveler's Proposed Jury Instructions) filed.
Date: 2015-04-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/08/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/09/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jonathan N. King) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jax Kneppers) filed.
Date: 2014-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2015-04-13T00:00:00Trial Brief (Trial Brief Re: Brandt Fees) filed.
Date: 2015-04-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/10/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/15/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/14/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-14T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of change of firm name) filed.
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/16/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/17/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Trial Brief (Centex homes' Brief regarding appropriate measure of Attorneys' fees) filed.
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/20/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Trial Brief (Centex Homes' Brief regarding the enforceability of its alternative fee arrangement) filed.
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/21/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Centex's /Proposed) Jury Instructions objected to by Travelers') filed.
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Trial Brief (Travelers' Bench Brief re waiver and Travelers' right to control the defense) filed.
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Agreed upon Joint Jury Instructions) filed.
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Travelers' Jury Instructions objected to by Centex) filed.
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Notice - Other (Association of Attorney) filed.
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/22/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Objection (Centex's Objections to Traveler's Proposed Jury Instructions) filed.
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Travelers' Amended Proposed Jury Instructions) filed.
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/23/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Travelers' Proposed Special Jury Instructions No. 16) filed.
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/24/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00Trial Brief (Trial Brief Re Insurer's Estoppel cannot create coverage) filed.
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/27/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/28/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/30/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 04/29/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Response to Jury's Request (Juror Response No. 1..5/1/15) filed.
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Juror Questions filed.
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Response to Jury's Request (Jury Response No. 2..5/1/15) filed.
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 05/01/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Response to Jury's Request (Response to Jury's Request #4) filed.
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Jury Instructions (GIVEN)) filed.
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Verdict (Special Verdict No. 1,2,3,4,and 5) filed.
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 05/04/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Statement of Decision (Attached is the Certificate of Service by mailing) filed.
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Court Reporter Roster filed.
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Exhibit List (Exhibit List of Court) filed.
Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00Exhibit List (Exhibit List of Plaintiff Centex Homes) filed.
Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00Exhibit List (Exhibit List of Defendant Travelers) filed.
Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Trial Status Conference
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 05/29/2015 10:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2015-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (Amended Proof of Service) filed.
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets set on 08/11/2015 11:00:00 AM published .
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 08/11/2015 11:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Long Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 10/13/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint Exhibit List) filed.
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Long Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 10/14/2015 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2015-10-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Long Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 10/15/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Court Reporter Roster filed.
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Exhibit List (for Defendant (Phase III Trial)) filed.
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint (Phase III Trial)) filed.
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Exhibit List (of Plaintiff (Phase III Trial)) filed.
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 04/07/2016 10:49:00 AM .
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of R.Brown) filed.
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (Electronic) filed.
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/02/2015 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Opposition (Traveler's Notice of Lodging deposition transcripts and video deposition testimony) filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (Centex Homes' Proof of service Re: Additional Trial Documents) filed.
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (Proof of Service Re Centex Homes' List of Disputed motions in Limine) filed.
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Service
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard on 07/28/2016 10:30:00 AM .
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 08/08/2016 10:31:00 AM .
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of A.Kelley) filed.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard on 09/27/2016 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Lodging filed.
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Correspondence (Correspondence Re: Complex Fees Paid) filed.
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Correspondence (Returned Mail) filed.
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Correspondence (Returned Mail) filed.
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Payment) filed.
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 01/12/2017 01:30:00 PM .
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Statement - Other (Travelers' Status Conference Statement) filed.
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Status Conference Statement filed.
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 02/09/2017 01:30:00 PM .
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended Ntc of Traveler's Mtn to Stay) filed.
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets set on 03/15/2017 09:30:00 AM published .
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 03/15/2017 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Designation and Notice to Reporters to Prepare Transcripts
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Status Conference Statement filed.
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Clerk's Declaration RE: Record on Appeal
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Clerk's Declaration RE: Record on Appeal
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets set on 01/18/2018 09:30:00 AM published .
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 01/18/2018 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:003DCA return receipt for CT/RT
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:003DCA return receipt for CT Supp
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Designation and Notice to Reporters to Prepare Transcripts
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:003DCA return receipt for CT
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Jared De Jong return receipt for CT
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Status Conference Statement filed.
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Clerks Declaration RE: Record on Appeal
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 07/19/2018 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Centexs Notice of Omitted Material Previously Designated for Inclusion in the Appellate Record
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:003DCA return receipt for Ct
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Statement - Other (Status Conference Statement) filed.
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 01/17/2019 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Statement - Other (In Preparation of The January 16,2020 Continued Case Management Conference) filed.
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 01/16/2020 10:00:00 AM .
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:003DCA remittitur issued, appeal is dismissed
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Status Conference Statement filed.
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Centex Homes only) filed.
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:003DCA remittitur issued, appeal is dismissed
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Zoom Information) filed.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 01/11/2021 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Zoom Information for Status Conference on January 11, 2021) filed.
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Status Conference Statement filed.
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice for Change of Time for Pre-Trial hearing on August 11, 2015) filed.
Date: 2015-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 04/27/2021 09:26:00 AM .
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 05/14/2021 01:30:00 PM .
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement (For Continued Case Management Conference On September 24, 2021) filed.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 09/16/2021 03:44:00 PM .
Date: September 16, 2021Notice - Other (Status Conference) filed.
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Notice - Other filed.
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Estimated Costs of Clerks Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Notice - Other (Re: Paying Fees Re: Clerks Transcript) filed.
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.