Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Je Higgins Lumber Company Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ramon Jimenez, against Harrow, Charles, Folsom Floor Gallery Inc, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: August 26, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: August 26, 2011Summons submitted by JE Higgins Lumber Company Inc rejected on 08/30/2011 .
Date: August 30, 2011Summons filed.
Date: September 12, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: October 07, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.